+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 399
- Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 11, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 10
March 5, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor