+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 290
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 7, 2021: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor