+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 28
- Effective date(s) 03/22/2019
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 20, 2019: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor