+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.