+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 188
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0096)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0118)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 26, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 12, 2019: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor