+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 396
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2