+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/10/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/3/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/3/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/18/2020
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/14/2020
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2020
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor