+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 202
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/3/2017
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/3/17
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor