+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
- Pub. Ch. 375
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 19, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0311)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0170)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 5
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 19
April 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 30, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor