+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 186
- Effective date(s) 04/23/2019; 01/01/2020
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 3
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0045)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 1
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0151)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2019: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor