+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/26/2021
- Pub. Ch. 553
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 5 (Amendment 2 - HA0438)
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 13, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0442)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0438)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0176)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0321)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27 Nays 5, PNV 2
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY CAMPBELL PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor