+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/29/2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 13, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor