+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 420
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0189)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0329)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/8/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee w/recommend
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/10/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 15, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 10
April 8, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 10
April 8, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor