+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 479
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2015
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment 1
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0360)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 2
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/23/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2015
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/10/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 82
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 82
March 23, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 17, 2015: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor