+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 428
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2017
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 59, Nays 13, PNV 8
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 4
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 13
March 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor