+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 4/13/21
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 7, 2021: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor