+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/29/2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2017
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/15/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/8/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor