+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 732
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0881)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0264)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0802)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. H&W Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/14/2014
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 1st cal. of 2014
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
March 19, 2014: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 8
March 11, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor