+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means to next calendar
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/31/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/31/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Rev Sub of FW&M 3/24/15
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor