+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/19/2017
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/19/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor