+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2013
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor