+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2017
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 18, 2017: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5