+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 409
- Effective date(s) 05/16/2013
- Pub. Ch. 409
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0152)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0323)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - SA0492)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA0491)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0146)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0292)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0461)
- Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/18/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recalled from S. Cal. Comm.
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. F,W&M Comm. 4/15/2013
- Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 0, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 15
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 32
April 15, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2013: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor