+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1030
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/23/2018
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm 4-11-17
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 11, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 11, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor