+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor