+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor