+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
- Pub. Ch. 395
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0431)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0350)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0431)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 3
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/16/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 24, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 16, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 3
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3