+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 340
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/7/2021
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 13, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor