+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor