+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
- Pub. Ch. 460
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 24, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0329)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0202)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 6
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 24
April 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor