+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
February 19, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor