+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor