+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/12/2013
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.