+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2020
- Pub. Ch. 362
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0312)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0066)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0312)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/24/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2019
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0091)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 24, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 4, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor