+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2020
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Recall from Committee Tabled, voice vote
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice to Recall from Committee Filed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Deferred to Summer Study
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Vote
April 9, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Deferred to Summer Study
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor