+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 578
- Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0236)
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 4 PNV 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0453)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0461)
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 21, Nays 9
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0339)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0450)
- Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 12, PNV 0
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Rule 39(3) Amend# 3 by Watson
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 12
May 4, 2021: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 4 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
April 7, 2021: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendments, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor