+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 457
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 3
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 16, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 3
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor