+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 3/14/2013
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C held on desk. Local Bill
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 14, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31