+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 347
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0257)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0444)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor