+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 240
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/20/2017
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/12/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/5/2017
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/29/2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/15/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/8/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
April 10, 2017: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor