+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 270
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0145)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/12/2021
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0114)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0145)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0031)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 0, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2021: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor