+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 192
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/3/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
March 29, 2017: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor