+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/2/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor