+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 226
- Effective date(s) 04/28/2017; 07/01/2017
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0158)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0112)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/20/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/14/2017
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/7/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/28/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/21/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
March 14, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor