+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 161
- Effective date(s) 04/24/2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 9, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0130)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0048)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/6/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/28/2017
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/14/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
- Recalled from Senate Education Committee
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 9
March 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 6
February 28, 2017: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor