+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 318
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB subst.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 1
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 20, 2013: S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor