+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
- Pub. Ch. 366
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/5/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/16/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 27, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 30, 2021: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 16, 2021: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor