+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
- Pub. Ch. 576
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0450)
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0448)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
May 4, 2021: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 31, 2021: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9