+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 343
- Effective date(s) 05/04/2015
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 22, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2015
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/25/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (7)
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 5, 2015: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2015: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2015: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor