+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/8/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor